Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521 /CH0649
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender Registrant - Notice of International Travel
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949 (SB0739)
Title
Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of Israel
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business Internationally
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 (HB0949)
Title
Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of Israel
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0521 /CH0649 Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender Registrant - Notice of International Travel Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0949 (SB0739) Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of Israel Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 Task Force to Study the Feasibility of and Impact on Small and Minority Businesses in Maryland Conducting Business Internationally Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
SB0739 (HB0949) Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of Israel Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM