Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Election Law - Online Platforms - Anonymous Foreign Political Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - International Day of the Girl
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0104
Title
Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0403
Title
Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042
Title
Family Law - Removal of Child From United States - Injunction
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0682 Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 Election Law - Online Platforms - Anonymous Foreign Political Communications Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0744 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - International Day of the Girl Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 /CH0104 Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Finance
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0403 Election Law - Election Service Providers - Contract Clauses and Termination of Contract Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1042 Family Law - Removal of Child From United States - Injunction Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM