Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Interstate Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 /CH0627 (SB0138)
Title
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229
Title
Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 /CH0291 (SB0389/CH0292)
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Application Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 (SB0227)
Title
Small Business Fairness Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937
Title
Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0894)
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Modification of Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1522
Title
Handgun Permits - Universal Recognition
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1659 (SB0789)
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Purchases
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1794 /CH0342
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 (HB0003/CH0627)
Title
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 (HB0842)
Title
Small Business Fairness Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 /CH0292 (HB0452/CH0291)
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB1659)
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Purchases
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB1089)
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1025
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State Vendors
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1090 /CH0341
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 /CH0627 (SB0138) Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0229 Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0452 /CH0291 (SB0389/CH0292) Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal Delegate Carr 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0477 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0739 Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Application Fee Exemption Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0842 (SB0227) Small Business Fairness Act of 2018 Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0937 Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0894) Metro Oversight Enhancement Act Delegate Barron 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Modification of Orders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1522 Handgun Permits - Universal Recognition Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1659 (SB0789) Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Purchases Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1794 /CH0342 Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0138 (HB0003/CH0627) Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership Senator Conway 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0227 (HB0842) Small Business Fairness Act of 2018 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0389 /CH0292 (HB0452/CH0291) Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0789 (HB1659) Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Purchases Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0894 (HB1089) Metro Oversight Enhancement Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1025 Department of Legislative Services - Study - Sales and Use Tax Collection by Out-of-State Vendors Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1090 /CH0341 Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM