Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Investments -see also- Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 /CH0081
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 /CH0071
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0535 (SB0603/CH0534)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 /CH0423
Title
Local Government Investments - Self-Insurance Funds and Trust Fund Accounts of Political Subdivisions
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0921)
Title
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303 (SB0751)
Title
Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 (SB0798)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0534 (HB0740/CH0535)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0070
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1303)
Title
Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1337)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 (HB1251)
Title
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 /CH0081 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0583 /CH0071 Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0740 /CH0535 (SB0603/CH0534) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0772 /CH0423 Local Government Investments - Self-Insurance Funds and Trust Fund Accounts of Political Subdivisions Delegate George 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1251 (SB0921) Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Reassigned to Economic Matters and Appropriations
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1303 (SB0751) Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 (SB0798) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HJ0008 (SJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0603 /CH0534 (HB0740/CH0535) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0661 /CH0070 Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0735 Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0751 (HB1303) Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0798 (HB1337) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0921 (HB1251) Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2014 - 8:30 AM
Finance
SJ0008 (HJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM