Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256 (SB0397)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0327 /CH0240
Title
Health - Ambulatory Surgical Facility - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Award of Grant - Study of Past Practices at State Psychiatric Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 /CH0261
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Licensees Providing Services to Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Emergency Action
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0263 (SB0513)
Title
Hospitals - Rate-Setting - Participation in 340B Program Under the Federal Public Health Service Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0112
Title
HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006 (SB0572)
Title
Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0697)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need Projections
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384
Title
Mental Hygiene Community-Based Services Fund - Residential Rehabilitation Programs
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB0256)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - Employees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0613/CH0263)
Title
Hospitals - Rate-Setting - Participation in 340B Program Under the Federal Public Health Service Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572 (HB1006)
Title
Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0041
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 (HB1053)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795
Title
Health Care Facilities - Cost of Residents' Care - Determination and Payment of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 (SB0397) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - Employees Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0327 /CH0240 Health - Ambulatory Surgical Facility - Definitions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Award of Grant - Study of Past Practices at State Psychiatric Institutions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0566 /CH0261 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Licensees Providing Services to Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Emergency Action Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0613 /CH0263 (SB0513) Hospitals - Rate-Setting - Participation in 340B Program Under the Federal Public Health Service Act Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 /CH0112 HIV Testing - Informed Consent and Pretest Requirements - Modification Delegate Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1006 (SB0572) Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 (SB0697) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need Projections Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0384 Mental Hygiene Community-Based Services Fund - Residential Rehabilitation Programs Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 (HB0256) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Licensees - Duties and Immunities - Employees Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 (HB0613/CH0263) Hospitals - Rate-Setting - Participation in 340B Program Under the Federal Public Health Service Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0572 (HB1006) Hospitals - Designation of Caregivers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 /CH0041 Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 (HB1053) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 Health Care Facilities - Cost of Residents' Care - Determination and Payment of Funds Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM