Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judgments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0038 (SB0061)
Title
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 (SB0562)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1502
Title
Civil Actions - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB1095)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 (HB0038)
Title
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284
Title
Business Regulation - Collection Agency Licensing - Exception for Passive Debt Buyers
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326
Title
Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0452)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1095 (HB1529)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0038 (SB0061) Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0452 (SB0562) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1032 Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act) Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act) Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1435 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1502 Civil Actions - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1529 (SB1095) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 (HB0038) Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 Business Regulation - Collection Agency Licensing - Exception for Passive Debt Buyers Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0326 Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0452) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Senator Raskin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1095 (HB1529) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM