Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judgments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 (SB0528)
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0480)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435 (SB0725)
Title
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 (SB0626)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0480 (HB0502)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate Judgment
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0222)
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB1511)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1435)
Title
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922
Title
Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0222 (SB0528) Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0502 (SB0480) Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate Judgment Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1435 (SB0725) Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Rules
HB1496 Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 (SB0626) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0480 (HB0502) Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate Judgment Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0222) Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 (HB1511) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 (HB1435) Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0950 Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM