Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Review -see also- Appeals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966 (SB1103)
Title
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood Blight
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1560
Title
Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1758 (SB0639/CH0013)
Title
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639 /CH0013 (HB1758)
Title
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1103 (HB0966)
Title
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0966 (SB1103) Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1219 Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood Blight Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1560 Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1758 (SB0639/CH0013) Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0639 /CH0013 (HB1758) Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures Senator Guzzone 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1103 (HB0966) Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM