Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0538)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Firearms Freedom Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 /CH0202 (SB0752)
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0439)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720
Title
Courts - Prosecution for Sex Offense - Evidence of Prior Act
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB1200/CH0202)
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860 /CH0201
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1090
Title
Prince George's County - Circuit Court - Attorney Appearance Fee
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0538) Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Delegate Summers 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0995 Firearms Freedom Act Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1200 /CH0202 (SB0752) Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0538 (HB0439) Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0720 Courts - Prosecution for Sex Offense - Evidence of Prior Act Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB1200/CH0202) Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0860 /CH0201 Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification - Procedures Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1090 Prince George's County - Circuit Court - Attorney Appearance Fee Prince George's County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM