Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891
Title
Voting Disclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0260 Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0891 Voting Disclosure Act of 2015 Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1135 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0293 Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Jury Sentencing Repeal Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Raskin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM