Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 /CH0131
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 (SB0236/CH0750)
Title
Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0750 (HB0073)
Title
Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 /CH0131 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0073 (SB0236/CH0750) Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0713 Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1030 Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0236 /CH0750 (HB0073) Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0775 Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0776 Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM