Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0550)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0551)
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 (SB0835)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings (Cameras in the Courtroom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0726)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0727)
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1034)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0726 (SB0550) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 (SB0551) Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 (SB0835) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1213 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1322 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Mass Murder (Capital Gazette Shooting Memorial Act) Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB1376 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings (Cameras in the Courtroom Act of 2020) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0726) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0727) Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1034) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0921 Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 8:25 PM