Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Causes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 /CH0069 (SB0087)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0366)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0414
Title
Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 (SB0476)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Feasibility of Repeal of Excluded Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 /CH0442 (SB0172)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912
Title
Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 314-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0686)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Courts - Juvenile Causes - Informal Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 (HB0131/CH0069)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0618/CH0442)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0337)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 (HB0586)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Feasibility of Repeal of Excluded Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1059)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856
Title
Courts - Juvenile Causes - Informal Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0131 /CH0069 (SB0087) Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0337 (SB0366) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0414 Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0586 (SB0476) Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Feasibility of Repeal of Excluded Offenses Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0618 /CH0442 (SB0172) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0659 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0671 Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0912 Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 314-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB1059 (SB0686) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 Courts - Juvenile Causes - Informal Adjustment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0087 (HB0131/CH0069) Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 (HB0618/CH0442) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Senator Gladden 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0337) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0476 (HB0586) Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Feasibility of Repeal of Excluded Offenses Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 (HB1059) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 Courts - Juvenile Causes - Informal Adjustment Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM