Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246
Title
Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video Conferencing
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 (SB0412)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711 (SB0732)
Title
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0639
Title
Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0454)
Title
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
Baltimore City - New Youth Detention Facility - Commission on Delinquency and Youth Detention Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 (SB0939)
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395
Title
Juvenile Services - State-Licensed Facilities - Size Limit Exception - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0433)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0848)
Title
Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and Detention
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678
Title
Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0711)
Title
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1307)
Title
Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0246 Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video Conferencing Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0433 (SB0412) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 (SB0732) Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0639 Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 (SB0454) Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1201 Baltimore City - New Youth Detention Facility - Commission on Delinquency and Youth Detention Prevention Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 (SB0939) Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 Juvenile Services - State-Licensed Facilities - Size Limit Exception - Repeal Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0412 (HB0433) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0454 (HB0848) Juveniles - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and Detention Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0732 (HB0711) Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1307) Juvenile Services - Group Homes and Institutions - Notice Requirement Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM