Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618 /CH0442 (SB0172)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0571)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Child Protection - Reporting Requirements - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0618/CH0442)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0856)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0618 /CH0442 (SB0172) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0671 Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 (SB0571) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0955 Child Protection - Reporting Requirements - Threat of Harm Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 (HB0618/CH0442) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Senator Gladden 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0856) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM