Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196
Title
Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0243)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 (SB0317/CH0063)
Title
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189
Title
Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0304)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0317 /CH0063 (HB1463)
Title
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Juvenile Services Education - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655)
Title
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0196 Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 (SB0243) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 (SB0317/CH0063) Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership Delegate Patterson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1634 /CH0655 (SB1072) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0081 Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0189 Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - Limitations Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0243 (HB0304) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0317 /CH0063 (HB1463) Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - Membership Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Juvenile Services Education - Modifications Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1072 (HB1634/CH0655) Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice System Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM