Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0938)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated Delinquent
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 (SB1134)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0996 /CH0573
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income (Hometown Heroes and Veterans Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 (SB0938) Criminal Procedure - Sentencing Guidelines - Previously Adjudicated Delinquent Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1524 (SB1134) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0996 /CH0573 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income (Hometown Heroes and Veterans Act of 2018) Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM