Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0659 /CH0560
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867 (SB0013)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345
Title
Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0867)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075
Title
Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Transfer of Jurisdiction - Community Detention
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0659 /CH0560 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0867 (SB0013) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1345 Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Expansion and Alterations Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0013 (HB0867) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0075 Juvenile Services Education Program - Employees - Employment Contracts and Leave Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0624 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Transfer of Jurisdiction - Community Detention Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM