Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Workgroup Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 /CH0297
Title
Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408 (SB0929)
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513 (SB0798)
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confidentiality of Records
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1513)
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1408)
Title
Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0528 Education - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Workgroup Extension Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0673 /CH0297 Juvenile Services - Facilities - Garrett Children's Center Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 297
Judiciary
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1408 (SB0929) Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 (SB0798) Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0314 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confidentiality of Records Senator Sydnor 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/17/2020 - 5:00 PM
SB0798 (HB1513) Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 (HB1408) Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program Senator Hayes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:15 PM