Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0497)
Title
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0557)
Title
Suicide Treatment Improvements Act
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0853)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0071)
Title
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0442)
Title
Suicide Treatment Improvements Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 (HB1187)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 (SB0497) Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
HB0400 Public Schools – Enrollment Location – Continuity Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 (SB0557) Suicide Treatment Improvements Act Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0850 Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1187 (SB0853) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0222 Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0497 (HB0071) Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0557 (HB0442) Suicide Treatment Improvements Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 (HB1187) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding Senator Carter 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 9:36 AM
Click to return on the top page