Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 /CH0653 (SB0674/CH0654)
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 /CH0688 (SB0650/CH0689)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0784)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0981)
Title
Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256 (SB0982/CH0487)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 /CH0689 (HB1081/CH0688)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0654 (HB0721/CH0653)
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1187)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 (HB1255)
Title
Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0487 (HB1256)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0721 /CH0653 (SB0674/CH0654) Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1081 /CH0688 (SB0650/CH0689) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1187 (SB0784) Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 (SB0981) Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 (SB0982/CH0487) Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-21)
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0650 /CH0689 (HB1081/CH0688) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 689
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0674 /CH0654 (HB0721/CH0653) Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 (HB1187) Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 (HB1255) Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 /CH0487 (HB1256) Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM