Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0580
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 (SB0299/CH0579)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479 (SB1066)
Title
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0669)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 /CH0211
Title
Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose Report
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0657)
Title
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0964)
Title
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 (SB1134)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1607 /CH0565
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1702 (SB1147)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1747 /CH0799
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0669
Title
Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0579 (HB0354)
Title
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 (HB1244)
Title
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0827)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1494)
Title
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 (HB0479)
Title
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134 (HB1524)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1147 (HB1702)
Title
Juveniles – Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 /CH0580 Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Appropriations
2/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0354 (SB0299/CH0579) Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0479 (SB1066) Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 (SB0669) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0922 /CH0211 Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose Report Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1244 (SB0657) Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1494 (SB0964) Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1524 (SB1134) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1607 /CH0565 Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1702 (SB1147) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1747 /CH0799 Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exceptions Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 799
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 /CH0669 Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court Records Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 669
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0299 /CH0579 (HB0354) Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0510 Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2018 - 9:30 AM
SB0657 (HB1244) Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0669 (HB0827) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 (HB1494) Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and Reports Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 (HB0479) Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health Assessment Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1134 (HB1524) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1147 (HB1702) Juveniles – Reportable Offenses Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM