Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Workers' Compensation (K1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 (SB0135/CH0324)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 (SB0095)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468 (SB0465/CH0036)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 (SB0464)
Title
Workers' Compensation Act - Frivolous Proceedings - Required Finding
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092 (SB0118)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Fees and Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 (HB0237)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 (HB1092)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Fees and Charges
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 /CH0324 (HB0173)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0339 (HB0012)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 (HB0830)
Title
Workers' Compensation Act - Frivolous Proceedings - Required Finding
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 /CH0036 (HB0468)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Incarcerated Employees
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Benefits - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339) Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 (SB0135/CH0324) Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0237 (SB0095) Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - Establishment Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0262 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0468 (SB0465/CH0036) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company Delegate Jameson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0563 Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional Officers Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 (SB0464) Workers' Compensation Act - Frivolous Proceedings - Required Finding Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2015 - 1:30 PM
HB0957 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law Enforcement Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1092 (SB0118) Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Fees and Charges Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2015 - 1:30 PM
SB0095 (HB0237) Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - Establishment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0118 (HB1092) Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Fees and Charges Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0135 /CH0324 (HB0173) Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Finance
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0331 /CH0339 (HB0012) Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0358 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0464 (HB0830) Workers' Compensation Act - Frivolous Proceedings - Required Finding Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 /CH0036 (HB0468) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0873 Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Finance
SB0874 Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - Incarcerated Employees Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Finance
SB0898 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Benefits - Compensation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM