Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Workers' Compensation (K1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 (SB0186)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 /CH0493
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0534)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0258)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 (SB0257)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0174)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 (SB0441)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Admissibility of Board Records - Workers' Compensation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1619 (SB0505/CH0394)
Title
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace Program
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB1053)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 (HB0504)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0943)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0710)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB1160)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Admissibility of Board Records - Workers' Compensation Commission
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0394 (HB1619)
Title
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534 (HB0693)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1058
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional Officers Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 (SB0186) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0631 /CH0493 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0693 (SB0534) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Compensation Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 (SB0258) Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 (SB0257) Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 (SB0174) Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1160 (SB0441) State Board of Physicians - Admissibility of Board Records - Workers' Compensation Commission Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1619 (SB0505/CH0394) Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace Program Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0174 (HB1053) Workers' Compensation Commission - Location of Hearings - Claims Filed by Employees of Governmental Agencies Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 (HB0504) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0257 (HB0943) Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 (HB0710) Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0441 (HB1160) State Board of Physicians - Admissibility of Board Records - Workers' Compensation Commission Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 /CH0394 (HB1619) Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0534 (HB0693) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Compensation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1058 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page