Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Workers' Compensation (K1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0751)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 (SB0051)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Workers' Compensation - Covered Employees - Performance of Essential Services During State of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 (SB0576)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly Wage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293 (SB0425)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294 /CH0070 (SB0426/CH0069)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 /CH0264 (SB0072/CH0263)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476 /CH0565 (SB0867/CH0566)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484 /CH0567 (SB0194/CH0568)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 (HB0559)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0263 (HB1315/CH0264)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194 /CH0568 (HB1484/CH0567)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 (HB1293)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426 /CH0069 (HB1294/CH0070)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB1101)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB0344)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 /CH0566 (HB1476/CH0565)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0344 (SB0751) State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0559 (SB0051) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0995 Workers' Compensation - Covered Employees - Performance of Essential Services During State of Emergency Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1101 (SB0576) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly Wage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1293 (SB0425) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of Claim Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1294 /CH0070 (SB0426/CH0069) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1315 /CH0264 (SB0072/CH0263) Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 /CH0565 (SB0867/CH0566) Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 /CH0567 (SB0194/CH0568) Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Economic Matters
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0051 (HB0559) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
SB0072 /CH0263 (HB1315/CH0264) Workers' Compensation - Tiered Rating Plans and Merit Rating Plans Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0194 /CH0568 (HB1484/CH0567) Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Payment of Medical Services and Treatment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0425 (HB1293) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Survival of Claim Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
SB0426 /CH0069 (HB1294/CH0070) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Total Disability - Survival of Claim Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0466 Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB1101) Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
SB0751 (HB0344) State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement and Workers' Compensation Benefits - Offsets Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Finance
SB0867 /CH0566 (HB1476/CH0565) Workers' Compensation - Failure to Report Accidental Personal Injury - Penalty Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM