Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Workers' Compensation (K1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 /CH0091
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 (SB0160)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0214
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 /CH0215 (SB0646/CH0216)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Annual Report - Return-to-Work
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0256 (SB0349)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 (SB0348)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Reimbursement for Medical Mileage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 (SB0435)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Continuing Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119
Title
Frederick County - Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease and Permanent Partial Disability - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 /CH0269
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063
Title
Uninsured Employers' Fund - Liability for Insolvent Self-Insured Employers - Limitation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 (HB0233)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0797)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Reimbursement for Medical Mileage
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 (HB0795/CH0256)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Provision of Medical Services and Treatment - Notification to Seek Treatment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0435 (HB0799)
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission - Continuing Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443
Title
Workers' Compensation - Discharge of Employee - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 /CH0216 (HB0604/CH0215)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law)
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963
Title
Public Information Act - Workers' Compensation Commission - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 /CH0091 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 (SB0160) Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 /CH0214 Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0604 /CH0215 (SB0646/CH0216) Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0791 Workers' Compensation Commission - Annual Report - Return-to-Work Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 /CH0256 (SB0349) Workers’ Compensation – Permanent Partial Disability – Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 (SB0348) Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Reimbursement for Medical Mileage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0799 (SB0435) Workers' Compensation Commission - Continuing Jurisdiction Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1119 Frederick County - Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease and Permanent Partial Disability - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1297 Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Baltimore City Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0062 /CH0269 Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 Uninsured Employers' Fund - Liability for Insolvent Self-Insured Employers - Limitation Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0160 (HB0233) Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0348 (HB0797) Workers' Compensation - Medical Benefits - Reimbursement for Medical Mileage Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0349 (HB0795/CH0256) Workers' Compensation - Provision of Medical Services and Treatment - Notification to Seek Treatment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0435 (HB0799) Workers' Compensation Commission - Continuing Jurisdiction Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 Workers' Compensation - Discharge of Employee - Prohibition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 /CH0216 (HB0604/CH0215) Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law) Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Finance
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0854 Workers' Compensation - Medical Cannabis - Compensation and Benefits Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 Public Information Act - Workers' Compensation Commission - Denial of Part of a Public Record Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM