Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0606)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791
Title
Military Service Credit - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 (SB0641)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 (SB0642)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 (SB0680)
Title
Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336 (SB0761)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521
Title
State Personnel – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 (HB0456)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB0844)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0922)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB0929)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 (HB1336)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0456 (SB0606) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0479 State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fees Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0791 Military Service Credit - Eligibility Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0844 (SB0641) State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance Delegate Lierman 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0922 (SB0642) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Delegate Lierman 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0929 (SB0680) Teachers’ Pension System – Vested Allowance – Break in Service Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1335 State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1336 (SB0761) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0521 State Personnel – Collective Bargaining Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0606 (HB0456) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0641 (HB0844) State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance Senator Elfreth 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0642 (HB0922) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Senator Elfreth 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0680 (HB0929) State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0761 (HB1336) State Retirement and Pension System - Executive Directors - Membership and Vesting Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:19 PM
Click to return on the top page