Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0282/CH0152)
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 (SB0038)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034 (SB0901/CH0358)
Title
Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Queen Anne's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 (SB0899/CH0573)
Title
Kent County - Gaming - Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 (HB0855)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0152 (HB0242)
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899 /CH0573 (HB1135)
Title
Kent County - Gaming - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901 /CH0358 (HB1034)
Title
Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0242 (SB0282/CH0152) Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0855 (SB0038) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 (SB0901/CH0358) Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation Queen Anne's County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1135 (SB0899/CH0573) Kent County - Gaming - Permits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0031 Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 (HB0855) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0282 /CH0152 (HB0242) Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 /CH0573 (HB1135) Kent County - Gaming - Permits Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0901 /CH0358 (HB1034) Kent County and Queen Anne's County - School Buses - Length of Operation Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM