Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0855)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 /CH0109 (SB0020)
Title
Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0140)
Title
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 /CH0285 (SB0139)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Wine Shop and Lounge License
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Kent County - Fisheries - Use of Haul Seines
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0864/CH0109)
Title
Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 (HB0877/CH0285)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Wine Shop and Lounge License
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 (HB0865)
Title
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0841)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 (SB0855) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 /CH0109 (SB0020) Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0865 (SB0140) Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 /CH0285 (SB0139) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Wine Shop and Lounge License Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1174 Kent County - Fisheries - Use of Haul Seines Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0020 (HB0864/CH0109) Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 (HB0877/CH0285) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Wine Shop and Lounge License Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0140 (HB0865) Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 (HB0841) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0938 Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM