Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 /CH0259
Title
Kent County - Fisheries - Use of Haul Seines
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 /CH0077 (SB0629/CH0076)
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925 (SB0959)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0729)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0076 (HB0358/CH0077)
Title
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1143)
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB0925)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0318 /CH0259 Kent County - Fisheries - Use of Haul Seines Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 /CH0077 (SB0629/CH0076) Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0925 (SB0959) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0729) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0629 /CH0076 (HB0358/CH0077) Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0728 (HB1143) Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0729 (HB1097) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0959 (HB0925) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1061 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM