Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 /CH0125 (SB0389/CH0126)
Title
Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305 /CH0304 (SB0628)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0458 (SB0629)
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0555)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684 /CH0006 (SB1024/CH0607)
Title
Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1597 (SB0551)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Echo Hill Outdoor School
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 /CH0126 (HB0302/CH0125)
Title
Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB1597)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Echo Hill Outdoor School
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0478)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB0305/CH0304)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB0312/CH0458)
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024 /CH0607 (HB0684/CH0006)
Title
Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0302 /CH0125 (SB0389/CH0126) Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 /CH0304 (SB0628) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0312 /CH0458 (SB0629) Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0478 (SB0555) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0684 /CH0006 (SB1024/CH0607) Education - State Grants for Education Aid Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1597 (SB0551) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Echo Hill Outdoor School Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 /CH0126 (HB0302/CH0125) Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0551 (HB1597) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Echo Hill Outdoor School Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0555 (HB0478) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0628 (HB0305/CH0304) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0629 (HB0312/CH0458) Kent County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1024 /CH0607 (HB0684/CH0006) Education - State Grants for Education Aid Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM