Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0435)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0807 (SB0173/CH0808)
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0240 (SB0172/CH0239)
Title
Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 (SB0022)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925 (SB1055)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Kent School
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Northern Bay Crossing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0673)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0239 (HB0300/CH0240)
Title
Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 /CH0808 (HB0225/CH0807)
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0435 (HB0169)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1055 (HB0925)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Kent School
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 /CH0606
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1177
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Chestertown Marina
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 (SB0435) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0225 /CH0807 (SB0173/CH0808) Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0300 /CH0240 (SB0172/CH0239) Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0673 (SB0022) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0925 (SB1055) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Kent School Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1199 Northern Bay Crossing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1432 Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot Program Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 (HB0673) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0172 /CH0239 (HB0300/CH0240) Kent County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0173 /CH0808 (HB0225/CH0807) Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0435 (HB0169) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Camp Fairlee Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1055 (HB0925) Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Kent School Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB1056 /CH0606 Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1177 Creation of a State Debt - Kent County - Chestertown Marina Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM