Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1614
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322)
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0777 /CH0322 (SB0792/CH0323) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1353 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1614 Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0792 /CH0323 (HB0777/CH0322) Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020 Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 323
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 2:18 PM