Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Municipal Corporations (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0627
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Environment - Well Drilling - Notification to Municipalities
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1136 (SB0523)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 (HB1136)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1022
Title
Prince George's County - Green Business Zones
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049 /CH0602
Title
Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0639 /CH0627 Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 Environment - Well Drilling - Notification to Municipalities Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1136 (SB0523) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 (HB1136) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Web Sites Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1022 Prince George's County - Green Business Zones Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
Finance
SB1049 /CH0602 Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM