Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Municipal Corporations (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277
Title
Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0280
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - Tie Votes
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0731
Title
Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0135
Title
Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1622 (SB0760)
Title
Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In Candidates
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248
Title
Municipalities - Vacant or Blighted Buildings - Registration and Remediation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326
Title
Municipal Elections - Certificates of Candidacy - Proof of Filing
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB1622)
Title
Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0277 Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County Laws Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0736 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0852 /CH0280 Local Government - Municipal Elections - Tie Votes Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 /CH0731 Montgomery County - Municipal Authority to Regulate Structures - Clarification PG/MC 112-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 /CH0135 Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized Uses Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1475 Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and Taxation Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB1622 (SB0760) Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In Candidates Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0248 Municipalities - Vacant or Blighted Buildings - Registration and Remediation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0326 Municipal Elections - Certificates of Candidacy - Proof of Filing Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0760 (HB1622) Municipalities - Municipal Elections - Regulations Governing Write-In Candidates Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page