Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Municipalities (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209
Title
Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Municipal Agreements PG 401-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390
Title
Montgomery County - Damascus - Zoning and Land Use Jurisdiction on Incorporation PG/MC 104-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 /CH0129
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0285
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB1005)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 /CH0746 (SB0730/CH0745)
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB1016)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 /CH0745 (HB0829/CH0746)
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0638)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016 (HB1131)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0209 Prince George's County - Asset Transfer for Magnetic Levitation Transportation System - Municipal Agreements PG 401-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0390 Montgomery County - Damascus - Zoning and Land Use Jurisdiction on Incorporation PG/MC 104-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0410 /CH0129 Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 /CH0285 Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Procedures Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 (SB1005) Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 /CH0746 (SB0730/CH0745) Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1131 (SB1016) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1246 (SB0954) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 /CH0745 (HB0829/CH0746) Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 (HB0638) Counties and Municipalities - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Agreements Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1016 (HB1131) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM