Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Municipalities (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0369
Title
Municipalities - Municipal Infraction Proceedings - Designation of a Building Inspector or an Enforcement Officer to Testify
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Transportation of Animals - Limitation on Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 (SB0718)
Title
State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 (HB1165)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0515 /CH0369 Municipalities - Municipal Infraction Proceedings - Designation of a Building Inspector or an Enforcement Officer to Testify Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 Counties and Municipalities - Transportation of Animals - Limitation on Authority Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1165 (SB0718) State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0718 (HB1165) Criminal Procedure - Government Agents - Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:15 PM