Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Taxing Districts (L4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0354 (SB0141/CH0353)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 /CH0304
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Extraordinary Development District PG/MC 109-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0353 (HB0602/CH0354)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0602 /CH0354 (SB0141/CH0353) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1198 /CH0304 Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Extraordinary Development District PG/MC 109-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0353 (HB0602/CH0354) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM