Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bi-County Agencies (L5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0562
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of Supplier Diversity and Inclusion and Minority Business Enterprise Program MC/PG 106-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0361
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0889)
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 /CH0563
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0336
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0561
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1356
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Entry Into Public Roadways - Regulations by Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1570
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority MC/PG 111-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB0326)
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0319 /CH0562 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of Supplier Diversity and Inclusion and Minority Business Enterprise Program MC/PG 106-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0320 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 /CH0361 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0323 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0326 (SB0889) Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0335 /CH0563 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0336 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0355 /CH0561 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1356 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Entry Into Public Roadways - Regulations by Municipal Corporations Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1570 Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority MC/PG 111-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0889 (HB0326) Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM