Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Local Government - Generally (L6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
State Development Plan - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0473 (SB0186/CH0472)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213
Title
Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of Denial
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0979)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0595)
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795
Title
Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951 /CH0625 (SB0774)
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260 (SB0644/CH0069)
Title
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Study
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0472 (HB0202/CH0473)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326
Title
Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513
Title
Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB0790)
Title
Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 /CH0069 (HB1260)
Title
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 (HB0951/CH0625)
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 (HB0729)
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 State Development Plan - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0082 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous Citations Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0202 /CH0473 (SB0186/CH0472) Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Economic Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0213 Local Government - Permit Review and Explanation of Denial Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0729 (SB0979) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 (SB0595) Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0795 Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0951 /CH0625 (SB0774) Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements Delegate McHale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2014 Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1260 (SB0644/CH0069) State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data Delegate Barve 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1407 Local Government - Restrictions on Income Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Study Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 /CH0472 (HB0202/CH0473) Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Glassman 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0326 Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 (HB0790) Local Government - Restrictions on Income-Producing Real Property - Fiscal Impact Review Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 /CH0069 (HB1260) State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 (HB0951/CH0625) Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0979 (HB0729) County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM