Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Local Government - Generally (L6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0279)
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0631 (SB0357)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 /CH0288 (SB0551)
Title
Land Use - Plans - Development and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 (SB0713)
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 (HB0404)
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333
Title
Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0631)
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0919/CH0288)
Title
Land Use - Plans - Development and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 (HB0989)
Title
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0107 Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0404 (SB0279) Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0631 (SB0357) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0919 /CH0288 (SB0551) Land Use - Plans - Development and Adoption Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0985 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 (SB0713) State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road Property Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 (HB0404) Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0357 (HB0631) Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation Adjustment Senator McFadden 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0551 (HB0919/CH0288) Land Use - Plans - Development and Adoption Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0713 (HB0989) State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact Analyses Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/05/2015 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM