Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0447 (SB0150/CH0446)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 /CH0117
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 /CH0130
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768
Title
Food Service Facilities - Industrially Produced Trans Fat - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773
Title
Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Burns
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Genetically Engineered Food - Disclosure and Labeling Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0641)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086 (SB0576)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Maryland Compassionate Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0446 (HB0133/CH0447)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0253
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521
Title
Agriculture - Meat and Poultry - Antibiotic Use - Labeling
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB1086)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1085)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781
Title
Pharmacists - Biosimilar Biological Products - Substitutions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 /CH0589
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's License
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 /CH0447 (SB0150/CH0446) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0455 /CH0117 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0482 Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Labeling Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 /CH0130 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0768 Food Service Facilities - Industrially Produced Trans Fat - Prohibition Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0773 Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - Tax Delegate Burns 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0903 Genetically Engineered Food - Disclosure and Labeling Requirements Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1085 (SB0641) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1086 (SB0576) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1100 Maryland Compassionate Care Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1415 Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment Delegate Myers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0150 /CH0446 (HB0133/CH0447) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0392 /CH0253 Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 Agriculture - Meat and Poultry - Antibiotic Use - Labeling Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB1086) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0641 (HB1085) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Senator Edwards 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0781 Pharmacists - Biosimilar Biological Products - Substitutions Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0955 /CH0589 Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's License Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM