Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080
Title
Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 /CH0338 (SB0758/CH0339)
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264 (SB1039)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0339 (HB1087/CH0338)
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1264)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1080 Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 /CH0338 (SB0758/CH0339) Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 (SB1039) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0339 (HB1087/CH0338) Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1039 (HB1264) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM