Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 /CH0370 (SB0290/CH0371)
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 (SB0922/CH0530)
Title
Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0063 (SB0935/CH0064)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1174
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0213
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Law Enforcement and Dispensaries
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692)
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0530 (HB0815)
Title
Public Health – Milk – Labeling
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935 /CH0064 (HB0939/CH0063)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001
Title
Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0770
Title
Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0527 /CH0370 (SB0290/CH0371) Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0632 Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0768 /CH0692 (SB0759) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 (SB0922/CH0530) Public Health – Milk – Labeling Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0939 /CH0063 (SB0935/CH0064) Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Delegate Miller 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1174 Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 /CH0213 Clean Cars Act of 2019 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0368 Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations Senator West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Law Enforcement and Dispensaries Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission Senator Kramer 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0759 (HB0768/CH0692) Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0922 /CH0530 (HB0815) Public Health – Milk – Labeling Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0935 /CH0064 (HB0939/CH0063) Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1001 Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew's Law) Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1004 /CH0770 Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM