Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014
Title
Pharmacists - Prescription Drug and Device Labels - Expiration Dates
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077
Title
Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0225)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490
Title
Montgomery County – Deer Management Permit Pilot Program MC 15–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038 (SB0747)
Title
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225 (HB0370)
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB1038)
Title
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 Pharmacists - Prescription Drug and Device Labels - Expiration Dates Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0077 Environment - Driveway Sealers - Prohibitions (Safer Sealant Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0370 (SB0225) Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act) Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0490 Montgomery County – Deer Management Permit Pilot Program MC 15–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0706 Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1038 (SB0747) State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0225 (HB0370) Education - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh's Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0747 (HB1038) State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:49 PM
Click to return on the top page