Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0457 (SB0334/CH0456)
Title
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389
Title
Lead Safe Income Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Maryland Compassionate Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254 (SB0242)
Title
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B Testing
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB1254)
Title
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0456 (HB0312/CH0457)
Title
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0312 /CH0457 (SB0334/CH0456) Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0389 Lead Safe Income Tax Credit Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 Maryland Compassionate Care Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1254 (SB0242) Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation Delegate Costa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0114 Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B Testing Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0242 (HB1254) Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0456 (HB0312/CH0457) Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Finance
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM