Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0251
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0675)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207
Title
Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205
Title
Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0665)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810
Title
Higher Education - Programs in Dental Hygiene and Medical Laboratory Technology - Transfer of Students and Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0490 /CH0251 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0665 (SB0675) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0952 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1207 Public Health - Forensic Laboratories - Regulation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0205 Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - Penalties Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0675 (HB0665) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 Higher Education - Programs in Dental Hygiene and Medical Laboratory Technology - Transfer of Students and Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page