Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 /CH0451 (SB0926/CH0450)
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0700)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0124
Title
Newborn Infant Screening - Testing by Nonpublic Laboratories - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392
Title
Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334
Title
Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0699)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 /CH0450 (HB0399/CH0451)
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0394 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0399 /CH0451 (SB0926/CH0450) Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice Delegate Afzali 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 (SB0700) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0827 /CH0124 Newborn Infant Screening - Testing by Nonpublic Laboratories - Notification Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider Directories Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB0699) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 /CH0450 (HB0399/CH0451) Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM