Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0709)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - MdBioLab STEM Education Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141 (SB1094)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0400)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices Study
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489
Title
Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 (HB1172)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1003)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - MdBioLab STEM Education Equipment
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB1443)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1094 (HB1141)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1003 (SB0709) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - MdBioLab STEM Education Equipment Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB1022 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1141 (SB1094) Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - Requirements Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 (SB0400) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Finance
HB1404 Public Safety - Sexual Assault Examination Kits - Best Practices Study Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1489 Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 (HB1172) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB1003) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - MdBioLab STEM Education Equipment Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0999 (HB1443) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1094 (HB1141) Criminal Procedure - Statewide Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit Tracking System - Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM