Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 (SB0900)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0187)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0384)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0654
Title
Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 (SB0706)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Laboratory Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 (SB0642)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069
Title
Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 (SB0777)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 (HB0240)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 (HB0652)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579
Title
Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0922)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706 (HB0810)
Title
Health Occupations – Pharmacists – Laboratory Tests
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB1349)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0217)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0217 (SB0900) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0240 (SB0187) Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0652 (SB0384) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0654 Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program - Alterations Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0706 Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0810 (SB0706) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Laboratory Tests Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0922 (SB0642) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Delegate Lierman 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1069 Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 (SB0777) Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2021 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0187 (HB0240) Criminal Procedure – Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0384 (HB0652) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Guidance and Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 (HB0922) State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification Senator Elfreth 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2021 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0706 (HB0810) Health Occupations – Pharmacists – Laboratory Tests Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0777 (HB1349) Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0828 HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0900 (HB0217) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:15 PM
Click to return on the top page